Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0137 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*SB0137.1*
2-January 13, 2022
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 137
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF SB 137 (Updated January 12, 2022 2:40 pm - DI 55)
6-Citations Affected: IC 27-1.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 27-1-30.2.
77 Synopsis: Group coverage for religious not-for-profits. Allows an
88 authorized property and casualty insurance company to provide group
99 property and casualty insurance to a religious not-for-profit association
1010 consisting of at least 10 religious not-for-profit organizations that have
1111 a relationship to one another in a common denomination, association,
1212 affiliation, or fellowship.
1313 Effective: July 1, 2022.
14-Raatz, Kruse
14+Raatz
1515 January 4, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial
1616 Institutions.
17-January 12, 2022, reported favorably — Do Pass.
18-SB 137—LS 6664/DI 55 January 13, 2022
17+2022 IN 137—LS 6664/DI 55 Introduced
1918 Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
2019 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2120 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2221 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2322 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2423 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2524 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2625 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2726 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2827 between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2928 SENATE BILL No. 137
3029 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3130 insurance.
3231 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3332 1 SECTION 1. IC 27-1-30.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3433 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3534 3 JULY 1, 2022]:
3635 4 Chapter 30.2. Group Property and Casualty Insurance for
3736 5 Religious Not-for-profit Organizations
3837 6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "property and casualty
3938 7 insurance" means one (1) or more of the types of insurance
4039 8 described in IC 27-1-5-1, Class 2 and Class 3.
4140 9 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "property and casualty insurance
4241 10 company" means a company authorized to make one (1) or more
4342 11 types of property and casualty insurance.
4443 12 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "religious not-for-profit
4544 13 association" means a group of ten (10) or more religious
4645 14 not-for-profit organizations that have a relationship to one another
4746 15 in a common denomination, association, affiliation, or fellowship.
4847 16 Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "religious not-for-profit
4948 17 organization" means an entity operating as a not-for-profit
50-SB 137—LS 6664/DI 55 2
49+2022 IN 137—LS 6664/DI 55 2
5150 1 organization for a religious purpose under Indiana law.
5251 2 Sec. 5. (a) An insurer authorized under IC 27-1-3-20 to transact
5352 3 business as a property and casualty insurance company may
5453 4 provide insurance to a religious not-for-profit association on a
5554 5 group basis.
5655 6 (b) A policy may not be issued or renewed to provide group
5756 7 coverage under this chapter to a group that includes fewer than ten
5857 8 (10) religious not-for-profit organizations.
5958 9 Sec. 6. The insurance commissioner may adopt rules under
6059 10 IC 4-22-2 to administer this chapter.
61-SB 137—LS 6664/DI 55 3
62-COMMITTEE REPORT
63-Madam President: The Senate Committee on Insurance and
64-Financial Institutions, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 137, has
65-had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same
66-back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
67- (Reference is to SB 137 as introduced.)
68-
69-ZAY, Chairperson
70-Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
71-SB 137—LS 6664/DI 55
60+2022 IN 137—LS 6664/DI 55