Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 54
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 318: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senators Ford J.D. and Melton added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Schaibley and Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Brown T
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Raatz added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senators Qaddoura and Niemeyer added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senators Boots and Baldwin
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senators Buchanan and Rogers
|
|
|