LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Indiana IN
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0145
Draft Versions
IN
Indiana Senate Bill SB0145
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Indiana 2022 Regular Session
Indiana Senate Bill SB0145
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 3, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 1, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 27, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 26, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 25, 2022
Bill
January 25, 2022
Compare
Fiscal Note
January 21, 2022
Bill
December 30, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
December 30, 2021
Enrolled
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 17, 2022
Compare
Bill
January 26, 2022
Compare
Bill
January 25, 2022
Compare