Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 57
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 265: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative Johnson added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative Lauer added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 85, nays 8
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Pressel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Walker K) prevailed; Roll Call 100: yeas 38, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Holdman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senator Walker K
|
|
|