House | 02/10/2022 | Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | House sponsor: Representative DeVon | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 46, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senators Brown L and Mishler added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Senators Gaskill, Qaddoura, Ford J.D. added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Senator Garten added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |