Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0180 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Fiscal Note January 12, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 7, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022
Fiscal Note January 5, 2022

Amended

Bill January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022