House | 02/07/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Young J | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 47, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senators Walker K and Koch added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senator Young M added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Senator Sandlin added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Authored by Senator Freeman |