House | 02/08/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senator Pol added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Miller D | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 48, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Tomes added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Niemeyer added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Authored by Senator Buck |