Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0283 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 01/27/2022

                            *SB0283.1*
January 28, 2022
SENATE BILL No. 283
_____
DIGEST OF SB 283 (Updated January 27, 2022 11:12 am - DI 87)
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Interim study of public notice publication. Urges the
legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on
government the topic of the publication of public notices in print
publications and digital publications.
Effective:  Upon passage.
Buck
January 10, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
January 27, 2022, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 283—LS 6912/DI 87  January 28, 2022
Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 283
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning state
and local administration.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) As used in this
2 SECTION, "committee" refers to the interim study committee on
3 government established by IC 2-5-1.3-4(11).
4 (b) The legislative council is urged to assign to the committee the
5 task of studying the topic of the publication of public notices in
6 print publications and digital publications.
7 (c) This SECTION expires January 1, 2023.
8 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
SB 283—LS 6912/DI 87 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to
which was referred Senate Bill No. 283, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert the following:
(SEE TEXT OF BILL)
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 283 as introduced.)
BUCK, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0.
SB 283—LS 6912/DI 87