Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Public Law 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Representatives Lauer, Andrade M, Moseley, Harris added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Rule 105.2 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 97, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Representative Frye added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Crider
|
|
|