Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 62
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 89, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Morrison) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Barrett
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Charbonneau
|
|
|