Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0298 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 4, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 20, 2022
Fiscal Note January 18, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022
Fiscal Note January 12, 2022
Fiscal Note January 10, 2022
Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Amended

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022