Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 132
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 387: yeas 92, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 366: yeas 35, nays 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Raatz added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Raatz removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Cook and DeLaney
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Melton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Buchanan and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 75, nays 22
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Representatives Goodrich and Teshka J added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Behning
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 37, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Crane added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Raatz added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Kruse added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Authored by Senator Buchanan
|
|
|