Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 10, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Fiscal Note January 14, 2022
Fiscal Note January 10, 2022
Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 31, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2022

Amended

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 31, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022