House | 02/17/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka J and Davisson J. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Morris | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Amendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Pol added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Senator Koch added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Senator Perfect added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Senator Buchanan added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Authored by Senator Brown L |