House | 02/08/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Lehman | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Amendment #1 (Buchanan) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senators Rogers and Raatz added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senator Lanane added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Authored by Senators Buchanan, Baldwin, Busch |