Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 137
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 399: yeas 66, nays 32
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 372: yeas 38, nays 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Cherry added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Porter removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Buchanan added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Niezgodski removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Buchanan removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Buchanan and Lanane
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Niezgodski
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Clere, Thompson, Heine, DeLaney, Errington and Pryor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Brown T and Porter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 60, nays 37
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Errington) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Brown T
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 37, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Buchanan added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Authored by Senator Holdman
|
|
|