Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 11, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Amended

Bill March 9, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022
Bill January 25, 2022