Senate | 03/07/2022 | Public Law 29 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 95, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 186: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Amendment #1 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Zay added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Authored by Senator Bassler |