House | 02/08/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senators Pol and Melton added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Cosponsors: Representatives Pryor, Andrade M, Bauer M | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative DeVon | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senators Yoder and Ford J.D. added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senator Ford Jon added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senator Rogers added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Senator Ford Jon removed as second author | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Senator Ford Jon added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Authored by Senator Qaddoura |