Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Public Law 31
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 93, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Sandlin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Walker K added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Lehman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Authored by Senator Zay
|
|
|