Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022
Fiscal Note January 12, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2022

Amended

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022