Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 90
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 328: yeas 34, nays 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 84, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Negele) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative Negele added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Representative Moed added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Soliday
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 41, nays 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Authored by Senator Messmer
|
|
|