Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 3, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Fiscal Note January 28, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 12, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Amended

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022