Senate | 02/23/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 61, nays 37 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Representative Lauer added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Garten | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 8: yeas 31, nays 61 | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Authored by Representative Pressel | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Engleman |