39 | 38 | | First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023) |
---|
40 | 39 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
41 | 40 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
42 | 41 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
43 | 42 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
44 | 43 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
45 | 44 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
46 | 45 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
47 | 46 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
48 | 47 | | between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
49 | 48 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1035 |
---|
50 | 49 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning local |
---|
51 | 50 | | government. |
---|
52 | 51 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
53 | 52 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 36-2-15-0.4 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
54 | 53 | | 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
55 | 54 | | 3 1, 2023]: Sec. 0.4. (a) This section applies if a majority of the voters |
---|
56 | 55 | | 4 voting on the public question required by IC 36-6-5-5 vote "yes" at |
---|
57 | | - | 5 the November 2024 general election. |
---|
58 | | - | 6 (b) Effective January 1, 2026, the following apply: |
---|
59 | | - | 7 (1) Employment positions as of December 31, 2025, of each |
---|
| 56 | + | 5 the November 2026 general election. |
---|
| 57 | + | 6 (b) Effective January 1, 2028, the following apply: |
---|
| 58 | + | 7 (1) Employment positions as of December 31, 2027, of each |
---|
79 | 78 | | 9 position. |
---|
80 | 79 | | 10 (d) The township assessor shall transfer to the county assessor |
---|
81 | 80 | | 11 all revenue received after the date of the transfer that is received |
---|
82 | 81 | | 12 by the township for the purpose of carrying out property |
---|
83 | 82 | | 13 assessment duties in the amount determined by the county auditor. |
---|
84 | 83 | | 14 SECTION 2. IC 36-6-5-5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
85 | 84 | | 15 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
86 | 85 | | 16 1, 2023]: Sec. 5. (a) This section applies only to a county if the |
---|
87 | 86 | | 17 county has one (1) or more township assessors. |
---|
88 | 87 | | 18 (b) The county election board of the county shall place on the |
---|
90 | 89 | | 20 question: |
---|
91 | 90 | | 21 "Shall the county discontinue paying for the cost of township |
---|
92 | 91 | | 22 assessors in the county?". |
---|
93 | 92 | | 23 (c) The following language shall be placed immediately below |
---|
94 | 93 | | 24 the language of the public question stated in subsection (b): |
---|
95 | 94 | | 25 "If a majority of the voters vote "yes" on this public question, |
---|
96 | 95 | | 26 the office of township assessor in the county will be abolished |
---|
97 | 96 | | 27 and all of its functions transferred to the county assessor. |
---|
98 | 97 | | 28 If a majority of the voters vote "no" on this public question, |
---|
99 | 98 | | 29 the office of township assessor in the county will continue.". |
---|
100 | 99 | | 30 (d) Except as provided in this section, IC 3-10-9-4 applies to the |
---|
101 | 100 | | 31 form of the public question required by this section. |
---|
102 | 101 | | 32 (e) The county election board shall: |
---|
103 | 102 | | 33 (1) tabulate the votes cast on the public question stated in |
---|
104 | 103 | | 34 subsection (b); and |
---|
105 | 104 | | 35 (2) certify the results under IC 3-12-4-9 and to the department |
---|
106 | 105 | | 36 of local government finance. |
---|
107 | 106 | | 37 (f) IC 3 applies to the public question required by this section |
---|
108 | 107 | | 38 except where IC 3 conflicts with this section. |
---|
109 | 108 | | 39 (g) If a majority of the voters voting on the public question vote |
---|
110 | | - | 40 "yes", notwithstanding section 1 of this chapter, the following |
---|
111 | | - | 41 apply: |
---|
112 | | - | 42 (1) After January 1, 2025, an election for township assessor |
---|
113 | | - | HB 1035—LS 6191/DI 134 3 |
---|
114 | | - | 1 shall not be held. |
---|
115 | | - | 2 (2) The office of each township assessor in the county is |
---|
116 | | - | 3 abolished, effective January 1, 2026. |
---|
117 | | - | HB 1035—LS 6191/DI 134 4 |
---|
118 | | - | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
119 | | - | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Local Government, to which was |
---|
120 | | - | referred House Bill 1035, has had the same under consideration and |
---|
121 | | - | begs leave to report the same back to the House with the |
---|
122 | | - | recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: |
---|
123 | | - | Page 1, line 5, delete "2026" and insert "2024". |
---|
124 | | - | Page 1, line 6, delete "2028," and insert "2026,". |
---|
125 | | - | Page 1, line 7, delete "2027," and insert "2025,". |
---|
126 | | - | Page 1, line 15, delete "2027," and insert "2025,". |
---|
127 | | - | Page 2, line 5, delete "2027," and insert "2025,". |
---|
128 | | - | Page 2, line 8, delete "2027," and insert "2025,". |
---|
129 | | - | Page 2, line 19, delete "2026" and insert "2024". |
---|
130 | | - | Page 2, delete lines 39 through 42, begin a new paragraph and |
---|
131 | | - | insert: |
---|
132 | | - | "(g) If a majority of the voters voting on the public question vote |
---|
133 | | - | "yes", notwithstanding section 1 of this chapter, the following |
---|
134 | | - | apply: |
---|
135 | | - | (1) After January 1, 2025, an election for township assessor |
---|
136 | | - | shall not be held. |
---|
137 | | - | (2) The office of each township assessor in the county is |
---|
138 | | - | abolished, effective January 1, 2026.". |
---|
139 | | - | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
140 | | - | (Reference is to HB 1035 as introduced.) |
---|
141 | | - | MAY |
---|
142 | | - | Committee Vote: yeas 9, nays 2. |
---|
143 | | - | HB 1035—LS 6191/DI 134 |
---|
| 109 | + | 40 "yes", notwithstanding section 1 of this chapter, the office of each |
---|
| 110 | + | 41 township assessor in the county is abolished, effective January 1, |
---|
| 111 | + | 42 2028. |
---|
| 112 | + | 2023 IN 1035—LS 6191/DI 134 |
---|