House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 130
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 443: yeas 89, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 384: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senators Buck and Byrne added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senator Garten added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 97, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Crider
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Representative Frye added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Representatives Pressel and Manning added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Authored by Representative Karickhoff
|
|
|