House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 133
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 395: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Becker added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 42, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek, Glick, Pol
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Representatives King J and Hatfield added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Representative Negele added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Authored by Representative Bauer M
|
|
|