House
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 74
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 40, nays 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 87, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Messmer
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Representative Fleming added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Authored by Representative Abbott
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Manning
|
|
|