House
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 78
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senator Glick added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer and Crider
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Olthoff) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Representative Haggard C added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Olthoff
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Bauer M and Frye R
|
|
|