| 1 | + | *EH1341.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | March 22, 2023 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1341 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1341 (Updated March 21, 2023 11:37 am - DI 140) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 36-8. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: PFAS-free firefighter gear. Provides that, after June 30, |
---|
| 9 | + | 2024, an Indiana fire department may not purchase firefighting gear |
---|
| 10 | + | unless it contains a permanently affixed label indicating whether or not |
---|
| 11 | + | the firefighting gear contains PFAS. |
---|
| 12 | + | Effective: July 1, 2023. |
---|
| 13 | + | Olthoff, Bauer M, Frye R, Haggard |
---|
| 14 | + | (SENATE SPONSORS — NIEMEYER, CRIDER) |
---|
| 15 | + | January 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public |
---|
| 16 | + | Safety. |
---|
| 17 | + | January 24, 2023, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 18 | + | January 26, 2023, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 27, 2023, engrossed. |
---|
| 20 | + | January 30, 2023, read third time, passed. Yeas 95, nays 0. |
---|
| 21 | + | SENATE ACTION |
---|
| 22 | + | February 27, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and |
---|
| 23 | + | Transportation. |
---|
| 24 | + | March 21, 2023, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 25 | + | EH 1341—LS 7172/DI 148 March 22, 2023 |
---|
1 | 26 | | First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023) |
---|
2 | 27 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
3 | 28 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
4 | 29 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
5 | 30 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
6 | 31 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
7 | 32 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
8 | 33 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
9 | 34 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
10 | 35 | | between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 36-8-27 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS |
---|
15 | | - | A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
16 | | - | 1, 2023]: |
---|
17 | | - | Chapter 27. PFAS-free Firefighter Gear |
---|
18 | | - | Sec. 1. (a) As used in this chapter, "firefighter gear" means any |
---|
19 | | - | clothing designed, intended, or marketed to be a structural |
---|
| 41 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 36-8-27 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS |
---|
| 42 | + | 2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
| 43 | + | 3 1, 2023]: |
---|
| 44 | + | 4 Chapter 27. PFAS-free Firefighter Gear |
---|
| 45 | + | 5 Sec. 1. (a) As used in this chapter, "firefighter gear" means any |
---|
| 46 | + | 6 clothing designed, intended, or marketed to be a structural |
---|
| 47 | + | 7 firefighting protective ensemble or ensemble element that includes: |
---|
| 48 | + | 8 (1) coats; |
---|
| 49 | + | 9 (2) trousers; |
---|
| 50 | + | 10 (3) coveralls; |
---|
| 51 | + | 11 (4) helmets; |
---|
| 52 | + | 12 (5) gloves; |
---|
| 53 | + | 13 (6) footwear; |
---|
| 54 | + | 14 (7) interface components; and |
---|
| 55 | + | 15 (8) other components used to construct such clothing. |
---|
| 56 | + | 16 (b) As used in this chapter, "PFAS chemical" has the meaning |
---|
| 57 | + | 17 set forth in IC 36-8-10.7-3. |
---|
| 58 | + | EH 1341—LS 7172/DI 148 2 |
---|
| 59 | + | 1 Sec. 2. After June 30, 2024, an Indiana fire department may not |
---|
| 60 | + | 2 purchase firefighter gear unless it contains a permanently affixed |
---|
| 61 | + | 3 label indicating whether or not the firefighter gear contains a |
---|
| 62 | + | 4 PFAS chemical. |
---|
| 63 | + | EH 1341—LS 7172/DI 148 3 |
---|
| 64 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 65 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public |
---|
| 66 | + | Safety, to which was referred House Bill 1341, has had the same under |
---|
| 67 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with |
---|
| 68 | + | the recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 69 | + | (Reference is to HB 1341 as introduced.) |
---|
| 70 | + | FRYE R |
---|
| 71 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 |
---|
| 72 | + | _____ |
---|
| 73 | + | HOUSE MOTION |
---|
| 74 | + | Mr. Speaker: I move that House Bill 1341 be amended to read as |
---|
| 75 | + | follows: |
---|
| 76 | + | Page 1, line 6, delete "worn by a" and insert "a structural |
---|
28 | | - | (8) other components used to construct such clothing. |
---|
29 | | - | (b) As used in this chapter, "PFAS chemical" has the meaning |
---|
30 | | - | set forth in IC 36-8-10.7-3. |
---|
31 | | - | Sec. 2. After June 30, 2024, an Indiana fire department may not |
---|
32 | | - | purchase firefighter gear unless it contains a permanently affixed |
---|
33 | | - | label indicating whether or not the firefighter gear contains a |
---|
34 | | - | PFAS chemical. |
---|
35 | | - | HEA 1341 Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
36 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
38 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
39 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
40 | | - | HEA 1341 |
---|
| 85 | + | (8) other components used to construct such clothing.". |
---|
| 86 | + | Page 1, delete lines 7 through 8. |
---|
| 87 | + | (Reference is to HB 1341 as printed January 24, 2023.) |
---|
| 88 | + | OLTHOFF |
---|
| 89 | + | _____ |
---|
| 90 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 91 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security |
---|
| 92 | + | and Transportation, to which was referred House Bill No. 1341, has |
---|
| 93 | + | had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same |
---|
| 94 | + | back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. |
---|
| 95 | + | (Reference is to HB 1341 as reprinted January 27, 2023.) |
---|
| 96 | + | |
---|
| 97 | + | CRIDER, Chairperson |
---|
| 98 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0 |
---|
| 99 | + | EH 1341—LS 7172/DI 148 |
---|