House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 231
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 498: yeas 48, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the House; Roll Call 514: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 2 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 2 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Motion to withdraw CCR #1: prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 461: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Ford J.D., Bassler and Crane
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, McGuire and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Goodrich and Klinker
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 45, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senators Raatz, Crane, Dernulc, Donato, Ford J.D. added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers, Bassler, Buchanan
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Representative Klinker added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Goodrich
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Behning and Karickhoff
|
|
|