House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 150
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 466: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 444: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 186: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Representative Pfaff added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative McNamara
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Davis and Goodrich
|
|
|