Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1506 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2023

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1506
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 10-19-2.1-2.
Synopsis:  First responders recognition monument. Establishes the
American first responders recognition monument committee
(committee). Provides that the purpose of the American first responders
recognition monument is to reflect on the sacrifice made by first
responders catastrophically injured in the line of service. Provides that
the purpose of the committee is to administer the disbursement of funds
to responsible artisans and organizations to facilitate the design,
prototyping, fabrication, and installation of the American first
responders recognition monument. Establishes the membership of the
committee. Appropriates $350,000 from the state general fund to the
department of homeland security (department) to be used by the
department to make disbursements to responsible artisans and
organizations to facilitate the design, prototyping, fabrication, and
installation of the American first responders recognition monument.
Effective:  July 1, 2023.
Speedy
January 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public
Safety.
2023	IN 1506—LS 7386/DI 134 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1506
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
public safety and to make an appropriation.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 10-19-2.1-2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2023]: Sec. 2. (a) The American first responders recognition
4 monument committee is established.
5 (b) The purpose of the American first responders recognition
6 monument is to reflect on the sacrifice made by first responders
7 catastrophically injured in the line of service who:
8 (1) are injured in a permanently life-altering fashion; or
9 (2) may never return to a normally productive life.
10 (c) The purpose of the American first responders recognition
11 monument committee is to administer the disbursement of funds
12 appropriated by the general assembly to the department of
13 homeland security to responsible artisans and organizations to
14 facilitate the design, prototyping, fabrication, and installation of
15 the American first responders recognition monument.
16 (d) The American first responders recognition monument
17 committee consists of the following seven (7) members:
2023	IN 1506—LS 7386/DI 134 2
1 (1) Two (2) members of the senate who are not members of
2 the same political party, appointed by the president pro
3 tempore of the senate.
4 (2) Two (2) members of the house of representatives who are
5 not members of the same political party, appointed by the
6 speaker of the house of representatives.
7 (3) One (1) representative from the department of homeland
8 security appointed by the governor.
9 (4) One (1) representative from the department of
10 administration appointed by the governor.
11 (5) One (1) of the following appointed by the governor:
12 (A) An emergency medical responder (as defined in
13 IC 16-18-2-109.8).
14 (B) An emergency medical technician (as defined in
15 IC 16-18-2-112).
16 (C) A firefighter (as defined in IC 35-44.1-4-3).
17 (D) A member of the fraternal order of police or similar
18 association.
19 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023] (a) There is
20 appropriated from the state general fund to the department of
21 homeland security three hundred fifty thousand dollars ($350,000)
22 for the biennium beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025,
23 for the purpose of making disbursements to responsible artisans
24 and organizations to facilitate the design, prototyping, fabrication,
25 and installation of the American first responders recognition
26 monument to reflect on the sacrifice made by first responders
27 catastrophically injured in the line of service.
28 (b) This SECTION expires June 30, 2025.
2023	IN 1506—LS 7386/DI 134