House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 240
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 538: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Judy added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Speedy removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Judy removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Hunley and Garten
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Judy, O'Brien and Klinker
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Speedy and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Garten
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Representative O'Brien T added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Representative Andrade M added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Representative Judy added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Speedy
|
|
|