House | 05/01/2023 | Public Law 156 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 449: yeas 50, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 93, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Representative McGuire J added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Authored by Representative Heaton |