Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 95
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 347: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 348: yeas 96, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Representative Pryor added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Representative Behning added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Cosponsor: Representative GiaQuinta
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative McGuire
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Senator Buchanan added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Senator Holdman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Sandlin
|
|
|