Senate | 04/20/2023 | Public Law 32 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 88, nays 2 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Manning | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 37, nays 12 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senator Alexander added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Authored by Senator Leising |