House | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Cosponsors: Representatives Clere, Errington, Pryor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Miller D | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 37, nays 9 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senator Walker G added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Senator Qaddoura |