Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0202 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 02/16/2023

                            *SB0202.1*
February 17, 2023
SENATE BILL No. 202
_____
DIGEST OF SB 202 (Updated February 15, 2023 7:01 pm - DI 149)
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign the
topic of various housing matters to the appropriate interim study
committee. 
Effective:  July 1, 2023.
Qaddoura, Walker G
January 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
February 16, 2023, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 202—LS 6821/DI 148  February 17, 2023
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 202
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning property.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023] (a) The legislative
2 council is urged to assign to the appropriate interim study
3 committee the task of studying the following topics:
4 (1) The implementation of a rent escrow program for tenants
5 in single and multifamily units.
6 (2) Protections for a tenant against a negligent out of state
7 landlord.
8 (3) Habitability and living condition standards for tenants in
9 single and multifamily units.
10 (4) Addressing the root causes of housing instability, including
11 evictions and lack of affordable housing.
12 (5) An examination of unsafe building and nuisance laws and
13 remedies available to local units of government for violations
14 by residential landlords.
15 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2024.
SB 202—LS 6821/DI 148 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Judiciary, to which
was referred Senate Bill No. 202, has had the same under consideration
and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the
recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
Delete the title and insert the following:
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning property.
Page 1, delete lines 1 through 17, begin a new paragraph and insert:
"SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023] (a) The legislative
council is urged to assign to the appropriate interim study
committee the task of studying the following topics:
(1) The implementation of a rent escrow program for tenants
in single and multifamily units.
(2) Protections for a tenant against a negligent out of state
landlord.
(3) Habitability and living condition standards for tenants in
single and multifamily units.
(4) Addressing the root causes of housing instability, including
evictions and lack of affordable housing.
(5) An examination of unsafe building and nuisance laws and
remedies available to local units of government for violations
by residential landlords.
(b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2024.".
Delete pages 2 through 9.
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 202 as introduced.)
BROWN L, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0.
SB 202—LS 6821/DI 148