Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 175
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 503: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 531: yeas 94, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Prescott, Abbott, Lindauer and Boy
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Baird and Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Breaux and Garten
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Leising and Qaddoura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 427: yeas 73, nays 25
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Hamilton) failed; Roll Call 403: yeas 27, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Baird) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senators Ford Jon and Tomes added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Gaskill added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Raatz added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Barrett, Prescott, Lindauer
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Baird
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 40, nays 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 26: yeas 8, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 25: yeas 8, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Authored by Senators Leising and Garten
|
|
|