Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 321: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 92, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 47, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senators Garten and Raatz added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senators Sandlin and Glick added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Bohacek added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Authored by Senator Freeman
|
|
|