Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 182
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 462: yeas 37, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 97, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 41, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Rogers added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Gaskill added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Buchanan) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Senator Buchanan
|
|
|