Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 44
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 89, nays 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Vermilion A, Olthoff, Jackson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Clere
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Melton added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senator Alting added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senators Hunley, Ford J.D., Donato, Rogers added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Walker G added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Senator Yoder
|
|
|