Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 113
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 436: yeas 95, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Representative Barrett added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Cosponsor: Representative Shackleford
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Vermilion
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senator Melton added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senators Brown L, Becker, Yoder, Bohacek added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Charbonneau added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Alting added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Qaddoura
|
|
|