| 1 | + | *ES0438.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | April 11, 2023 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | SENATE BILL No. 438 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF SB 438 (Updated April 11, 2023 9:28 am - DI 140) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 12-15. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Home health services. Requires the office of the secretary |
---|
| 9 | + | of family and social services to: (1) perform a comprehensive review |
---|
| 10 | + | of existing home health services for children with complex medical |
---|
| 11 | + | needs; (2) assess the home health services and policies for a person- |
---|
| 12 | + | centered approach; and (3) engage stakeholders in the assessment to |
---|
| 13 | + | solicit feedback on issues securing and maintaining home health |
---|
| 14 | + | services. |
---|
| 15 | + | Effective: July 1, 2023. |
---|
| 16 | + | Qaddoura, Alting, Charbonneau, |
---|
| 17 | + | Brown L, Becker, Yoder, Bohacek, |
---|
| 18 | + | Melton, Randolph Lonnie M |
---|
| 19 | + | (HOUSE SPONSORS — VERMILION, SHACKLEFORD, BARRETT) |
---|
| 20 | + | January 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider |
---|
| 21 | + | Services. |
---|
| 22 | + | February 16, 2023, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 23 | + | February 20, 2023, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 24 | + | February 23, 2023, read third time, passed. Yeas 48, nays 0. |
---|
| 25 | + | HOUSE ACTION |
---|
| 26 | + | February 28, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health. |
---|
| 27 | + | April 11, 2023, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 28 | + | ES 438—LS 6991/DI 104 April 11, 2023 |
---|
1 | 29 | | First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023) |
---|
2 | 30 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
3 | 31 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
4 | 32 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
5 | 33 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
6 | 34 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
7 | 35 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
8 | 36 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
9 | 37 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
10 | 38 | | between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 12-15-34-14.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
15 | | - | CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
16 | | - | [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 14.7. (a) As used in this section, |
---|
17 | | - | "office" refers to the office of the secretary of family and social |
---|
18 | | - | services. |
---|
19 | | - | (b) The office shall perform a comprehensive review of existing |
---|
| 44 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-15-34-14.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
| 45 | + | 2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
| 46 | + | 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 14.7. (a) As used in this section, |
---|
| 47 | + | 4 "office" refers to the office of the secretary of family and social |
---|
| 48 | + | 5 services. |
---|
| 49 | + | 6 (b) The office shall perform a comprehensive review of existing |
---|
| 50 | + | 7 home health services for children with complex medical needs. The |
---|
| 51 | + | 8 office shall assess the home health services and policies for a |
---|
| 52 | + | 9 person-centered approach that is aligned with state and federal |
---|
| 53 | + | 10 regulations. |
---|
| 54 | + | 11 (c) The office shall engage stakeholders in the assessment |
---|
| 55 | + | 12 described in subsection (b), including: |
---|
| 56 | + | 13 (1) consumers and family members of consumers; and |
---|
| 57 | + | 14 (2) home health care providers; |
---|
| 58 | + | 15 to solicit feedback about the issues that consumers and parents of |
---|
| 59 | + | 16 children with complex medical needs are having with securing and |
---|
| 60 | + | 17 maintaining home health services. |
---|
| 61 | + | ES 438—LS 6991/DI 104 2 |
---|
| 62 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 63 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Health and Provider |
---|
| 64 | + | Services, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 438, has had the same |
---|
| 65 | + | under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the |
---|
| 66 | + | Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as |
---|
| 67 | + | follows: |
---|
| 68 | + | Page 1, line 4, delete "includes:" and insert "refers to the office of |
---|
| 69 | + | the secretary of family and social services.". |
---|
| 70 | + | Page 1, delete lines 5 through 17, begin a new paragraph and insert: |
---|
| 71 | + | "(b) The office shall perform a comprehensive review of existing |
---|
20 | 72 | | home health services for children with complex medical needs. The |
---|
21 | 73 | | office shall assess the home health services and policies for a |
---|
22 | 74 | | person-centered approach that is aligned with state and federal |
---|
23 | 75 | | regulations. |
---|
24 | 76 | | (c) The office shall engage stakeholders in the assessment |
---|
25 | 77 | | described in subsection (b), including: |
---|
26 | 78 | | (1) consumers and family members of consumers; and |
---|
27 | 79 | | (2) home health care providers; |
---|
28 | 80 | | to solicit feedback about the issues that consumers and parents of |
---|
29 | 81 | | children with complex medical needs are having with securing and |
---|
30 | | - | maintaining home health services. |
---|
31 | | - | SEA 438 President of the Senate |
---|
32 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
33 | | - | Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
34 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
35 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
36 | | - | SEA 438 |
---|
| 82 | + | maintaining home health services.". |
---|
| 83 | + | Delete pages 2 through 5. |
---|
| 84 | + | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 85 | + | (Reference is to SB 438 as introduced.) |
---|
| 86 | + | CHARBONNEAU, Chairperson |
---|
| 87 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0. |
---|
| 88 | + | _____ |
---|
| 89 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 90 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Public Health, to which was |
---|
| 91 | + | referred Senate Bill 438, has had the same under consideration and |
---|
| 92 | + | begs leave to report the same back to the House with the |
---|
| 93 | + | recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 94 | + | (Reference is to SB 438 as printed February 17, 2023.) |
---|
| 95 | + | SCHAIBLEY |
---|
| 96 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0 |
---|
| 97 | + | ES 438—LS 6991/DI 104 |
---|