Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 118
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 361: yeas 45, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Representative Cash B added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 90, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Representative Judy added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Representative Frye added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Manning
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 42, nays 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senators Crane, Messmer, Tomes, Buck, Doriot added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senator Byrne added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Koch added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Garten added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Busch
|
|
|