House | 03/21/2023 | Representative Barrett added as cosponsor | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Returned to the Senate | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Representative Garcia Wilburn V added as cosponsor | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 269: yeas 95, nays 0 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Representative Vermilion A added as cosponsor | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Representatives Huston and added as cosponsors | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senators Alexander, Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Glick, Holdman, Hunley, Johnson, Koch, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Cosponsor: Representative Lindauer | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Rowray | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Second reading: adopted standing vote | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senator Walker K added as third author | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senator Baldwin added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Gaskill |