House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senators Buck and Doriot added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Becker added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 186: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senator Pol added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Tomes, Crider, Hunley
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representatives Bartels and Jeter C added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Gore
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pack
|
|
|