LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Indiana IN
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1021
Draft Versions
IN
Indiana House Bill HB1021
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Indiana 2024 Regular Session
Indiana House Bill HB1021
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note
January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note
January 29, 2024
Bill
December 22, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
December 22, 2023
Enrolled
Bill
February 28, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
February 20, 2024
Compare
Bill
January 29, 2024
Compare